Leave

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0194
    (SB0195 / CH0053)
Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of PersonnelCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0851Counties - Paid Sick Leave for Limited-Term Grant-Funded Employees - RequirementDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB0909Task Force to Study Paid Parental Leave PoliciesDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1175
    (SB0664)
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits ActDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1379
    (SB0813)
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1454Labor and Employment - Organ Donation LeaveDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0195 / CH0053
    (HB0194)
Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of PersonnelSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53Finance
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0472
    (HB0580)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0664
    (HB1175)
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0813
    (HB1379)
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0875State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Benefits StudySenator SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.