Leave

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0098
    (SB0135)
Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0306 / CH0179State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing MothersDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 179Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0775
    (SB0859 / CH0752)
State Employees - Parental LeaveDelegate KellyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0779Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Exemption - Facility With On-Site Health ClinicDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1364Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Calculation of Employees (Fair Sick Leave and Holiday Compensation Act)Delegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1421Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Worker RevisionsDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1525
    (SB0727)
State Personnel – Employee Mentoring LeaveDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0135
    (HB0098)
Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0712Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - ExemptionsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0727
    (HB1525)
State Personnel - Employee Mentoring LeaveSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0859 / CH0752
    (HB0775)
State Employees – Parental LeaveSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 752Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0890Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick LeaveSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.