Legal Aid

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0129
    (SB0262 / CH0035)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0153Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - ProvisionalDelegate AndersonIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0535Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program FundDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0838 / CH0072
    (SB0640 / CH0071)
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Extension of Termination DateDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1303 / CH0553
    (SB0809 / CH0552)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0234Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's CountySenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0262 / CH0035
    (HB0129)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0640 / CH0071
    (HB0838 / CH0072)
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Extension of Termination DateSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 71Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0809 / CH0552
    (HB1303 / CH0553)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.