Legal Aid

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0074 / CH0397Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Expansion of ScopeDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Ways and Means
2/5/2015 - 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0337
    (SB0366)
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as AdultsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0348
    (SB0468)
Civil Right to Counsel - ImplementationDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0361Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceDelegate VallarioIn the House - First Reading JudiciaryJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0391Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for ServicesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0457Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or WitnessDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0496
    (SB0942)
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0530Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - ProvisionalDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0596Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program CorporationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0667Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach PoliciesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0749
    (SB0817)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - ReportingDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1119
    (SB0646)
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload StandardsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1289 / CH0308
    (SB0941)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Judiciary
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0366
    (HB0337)
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as AdultsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0468
    (HB0348)
Civil Right to Counsel - ImplementationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0646
    (HB1119)
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload StandardsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0735Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility - RequirementsSenator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0817
    (HB0749)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - ReportingSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0941
    (HB1289 / CH0308)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)
SB0942
    (HB0496)
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.