Legal Aid

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0272Higher Education - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sanctuary Campus StatusDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0428
    (SB0574)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0839Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - ProvisionalDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0972 / CH0798
    (SB0811 / CH0797)
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Repeal of SunsetDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 798Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0991
    (SB0382 / CH0280)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite OrganizationsDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1065Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance TechnologiesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1215
    (SB0983)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1231Indigent Defendants - Caseloads - Panel Attorney ProgramDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1291
    (SB0856 / CH0839)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsDelegate Barnes, B.In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0382 / CH0280
    (HB0991)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite OrganizationsSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0574
    (HB0428)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Senator FeldmanIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0811 / CH0797
    (HB0972 / CH0798)
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Repeal of SunsetSenator ZirkinEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 797Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0856 / CH0839
    (HB1291)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsSenator GuzzoneEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0983
    (HB1215)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.