Legislation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0168
    (SB0576)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0309
    (SB0324 / CH0013)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Delegate BuschIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledAppropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0336 / CH0619
    (SB0161 / CH0658)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureDelegate VallarioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0401
    (SB0994)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - RevisionsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0417State Song - Replacement - State Song Selection Panel and CompetitionDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0430Education - Student Data Privacy CouncilDelegate KaiserIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0467Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and ProcessesDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0663
    (SB0580)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0666
    (SB0581)
Local Governments - Legal Notice RequirementsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0753
    (SB0808)
State BudgetDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0978
    (SB0604)
Task Force to Study Housing, Health, and Economic Stability of Maryland SeniorsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB1261State Archivist - Process for Evaluating State DesignationsDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1370General Assembly - Limitation on Introduction of BillsDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1406 / CH0244
    (SB1173 / CH0243)
Task Force to Study the Adult High School ConceptDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Economic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1413State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1466Task Force to Study Restorative Justice Discipline Practices in Maryland Public SchoolsDelegate Washington, A.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1499
    (SB0413)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution FundingDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Health (J1)
HJ0002
    (SJ0006)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0017 / CH0329
    (HB0984 / CH0330)
Open Meetings Act - Retention of Minutes and Recordings - RevisionSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0161 / CH0658
    (HB0336 / CH0619)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureSenator HoughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0198 / CH0661
    (HB0211 / CH0662)
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)Senator Nathan-PulliamEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0222Maryland State Song - Repeal and Replace - State Song Selection PanelSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0324 / CH0013
    (HB0309)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Senator MillerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0413
    (HB1499)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and ReportingSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Health (J1)
SB0576
    (HB0168)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0580
    (HB0663)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0581
    (HB0666)
Local Governments - Legal Notice RequirementsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0628General Assembly Standing Committees - Recorded Votes and Written TestimonySenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0808
    (HB0753)
State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0880Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in MarylandSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0994
    (HB0401)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - RevisionsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SJ0006
    (HJ0002)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.