Legislation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0003 / CH0627
    (SB0138)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0150 / CH0121Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Ways and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0244 / CH0071
    (SB0680 / CH0072)
General Assembly – Prefiled Bills – DeadlinesDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 71Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0348
    (SB0293)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0356
    (SB0307)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0537Potomac Compact for Fair RepresentationDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0716 / CH0082
    (SB0266 / CH0083)
Maryland Health Care Commission - Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas - StudyDelegate Lewis, R.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0874 / CH0281
    (SB0892)
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and DutiesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1062
    (SB0827)
Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Appointment of a Special Advisor – Development of a Remedial Plan (HBCU Equity Act of 2018)Delegate SydnorIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1089
    (SB0894)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActDelegate BarronIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1339
    (SB0213)
State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - ReductionsDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB1638
    (SB0788)
Public Information Act - RevisionsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1796State Procurement - Service Contracts - RenegotiationDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0004 / CH0473Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0138
    (HB0003 / CH0627)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
SB0213
    (HB1339)
State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - ReductionsSenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0266 / CH0083
    (HB0716 / CH0082)
Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – StudySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 83Finance
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0293
    (HB0348)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0307
    (HB0356)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0680 / CH0072
    (HB0244 / CH0071)
General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - DeadlinesSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0788
    (HB1638)
Public Information Act - RevisionsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0820State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0827
    (HB1062)
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Appointment of a Special Advisor - Development of a Remedial Plan (HBCU Equity Act of 2018)Senator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0892
    (HB0874 / CH0281)
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and DutiesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0894
    (HB1089)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1200 / CH0643Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Notice of Legislative ProposalsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 643Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:05 P.M.