Libraries

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0005
    (SB0184)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring LibraryDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0491 / CH0120Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth CentersDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0685
    (SB0633 / CH0512)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareDelegate GriffithIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0895 / CH0648Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 648Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1146 / CH0669Task Force to Study Locating Businesses in Libraries in Prince George's County PG 415-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 669Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0184
    (HB0005)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring LibrarySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0445Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Requirements and LimitationsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0471 / CH0277Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth CentersSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0633 / CH0512
    (HB0685)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB1055State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort RequirementsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.