Libraries

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0258
    (SB0780)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Elizabeth Seton High School Library RenovationDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0542 / CH0479
    (SB0264 / CH0478)
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of CounselDelegate O'DonnellEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0783
    (SB0309)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Early Literacy CenterDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1153State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public LibrariesDelegate ProctorIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB1155
    (SB0906 / CH0206)
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth CentersDelegate OttoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0264 / CH0478
    (HB0542 / CH0479)
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of CounselSenator MillerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0309
    (HB0783)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Early Literacy CenterSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0354Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's CountySenator HersheyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0360 / CH0162Calvert County - Budget Hearings and ProceduresCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0493Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of MarylandSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0780
    (HB0258)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Elizabeth Seton High School Library RenovationSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0789Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Nonprofit Organizations Authorized to Perform Auxiliary Library ServicesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0906 / CH0206
    (HB1155)
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth CentersSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.