Liens

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0088
    (SB0199 / CH0205)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0286 / CH0449
    (SB0161 / CH0448)
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of LiensDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0419 / CH0370Personal Property Tax - Liens for Unpaid TaxDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0502Owner or Operator of Livery Stable - Lien on Dairy AnimalDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0522
    (SB0465)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB0549
    (SB0145)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0621 / CH0625
    (SB0627)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0628Real Property - Maryland Contract Lien Act - Monetary JudgmentsDelegate NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0634Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0653 / CH0631Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of ViolationsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0794 / CH0640
    (SB0696)
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - LiensDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 640Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0811Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership CommunitiesDelegate NiemannIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0866Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0920Tax Liens - EnforceabilityDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0941 / CH0656
    (SB0770)
Criminal Law - Fraudulent Liens - ProhibitionDelegate AroraApproved by the Governor - Chapter 656Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1127 / CH0303
    (SB0634 / CH0302)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1130 / CH0541
    (SB0758 / CH0540)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentDelegate BarnesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1330 / CH0676Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer ComplianceChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1395Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxDelegate JamesIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1455 / CH0687Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1507 / CH0690St. Mary's County - Property MaintenanceSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 690Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1532
    (SB1062)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Attorney's FeesDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0028Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance AbatementSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0145
    (HB0549)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0161 / CH0448
    (HB0286 / CH0449)
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of LiensSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 448Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0199 / CH0205
    (HB0088)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0227Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Taxes, Interest, and PenaltiesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0465
    (HB0522)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
Finance
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0627
    (HB0621 / CH0625)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramSenator RamirezIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0634 / CH0302
    (HB1127 / CH0303)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0696
    (HB0794 / CH0640)
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - LiensSenator StoneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0758 / CH0540
    (HB1130 / CH0541)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0770
    (HB0941 / CH0656)
Criminal Law - Fraudulent Liens - ProhibitionSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1016Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsSenator FroshIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB1062
    (HB1532)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Attorney's FeesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.