Limited Liability Companies

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0002
    (SB0615)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0048
    (SB0060 / CH0146)
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance FeesChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0090
    (SB0426 / CH0171)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Requirements MC 17-15Montgomery County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0311
    (SB0704)
Alcoholic Beverages - Supermarkets - Class B and Class BLX LicensesDelegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0351Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company RepresentativeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0445Opportunity Bracket for Small BusinessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0497 / CH0253
    (SB0356)
Property Tax - Exemption - Low Income Housing - Ownership by Limited Liability CompanyDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0527 / CH0092Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency RequirementsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0584
    (SB0283)
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of a Municipal Corporation - Confidential InformationDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0617 / CH0264Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle Clubs PG 307-15Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 264Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0651Personal Property Reports - Exemption and AffidavitDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0720 / CH0270Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm PermitsDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 270Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0789
    (SB0584)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0879
    (SB0483)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability CompaniesDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1061
    (SB0300)
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0060 / CH0146
    (HB0048)
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance FeesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Judicial Proceedings
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0276Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Responsible OperatorSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0282Income Tax Credit - Pass-Through EntitiesSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0283
    (HB0584)
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of a Municipal Corporation - Confidential InformationSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0300
    (HB1061)
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0356
    (HB0497 / CH0253)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Exemption - Low Income HousingSenator McFaddenIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0426 / CH0171
    (HB0090)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License RequirementsSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0483
    (HB0879)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability CompaniesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0584
    (HB0789)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0615
    (HB0002)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsSenator EckardtIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0704
    (HB0311)
Alcoholic Beverages - Supermarkets - Class B and Class BLX LicensesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0866Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle ClubsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.