Limited Liability Companies

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0044Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability CompanyDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0135Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and AffidavitDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0201Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Resident Agent and Company RepresentativeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0272
    (SB0047 / CH0042)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability CompaniesAnne Arundel County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0276 / CH0352
    (SB0137 / CH0351)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0457
    (SB0385)
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0471
    (SB0622)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1070
    (SB0809)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertyDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1226 / CH0224
    (SB0597 / CH0223)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - ExemptionsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1250
    (SB0841)
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - ExemptionSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1274
    (SB0836)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1399
    (SB0910)
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - EstablishedDelegate HayesIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1544
    (SB1065)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0047 / CH0042
    (HB0272)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability CompaniesSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0137 / CH0351
    (HB0276 / CH0352)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0385
    (HB0457)
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0597 / CH0223
    (HB1226 / CH0224)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0622
    (HB0471)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0725 / CH0228Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and CorrectionsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0809
    (HB1070)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0836
    (HB1274)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0841
    (HB1250)
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - ExemptionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0910
    (HB1399)
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - EstablishedSenator FergusonVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1064Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB1065
    (HB1544)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.