Limited Liability Companies

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0308Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses MC 20-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0363 / CH0064
    (SB0111 / CH0063)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability CompanyDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0744 / CH0674
    (SB0481)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0991
    (SB0382 / CH0280)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite OrganizationsDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1062Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Revisions and Repeal of Firm PermitsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1184Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0111 / CH0063
    (HB0363 / CH0064)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability CompanySenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0382 / CH0280
    (HB0991)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite OrganizationsSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0481
    (HB0744 / CH0674)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0656
    (HB0714)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealSenator JenningsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB1086Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter RequirementsSenator ConwayIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.