Limited Liability Companies

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018
    (SB0993)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealDelegate ClarkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0448
    (SB0395)
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages License – Registered Voter RequirementsBaltimore City DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0613Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned BusinessesDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0876
    (SB0498)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned BusinessesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0901 / CH0135Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Licenses and TransfersHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1003 / CH0225Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - AuthorizedDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 225Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1095
    (SB0865)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1367
    (SB1040)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot PointDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1510Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual ReportDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1619Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole ProprietorshipsDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0070Corporations – Limited Liability Companies – Member–Trustees – EstablishmentSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0082 / CH0101Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Quantity and ResignationChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0395
    (HB0448)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Residency and Registered Voter RequirementsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Senate Requests House RecedeEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0498
    (HB0876)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned BusinessesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0865
    (HB1095)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0890Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick LeaveSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0993
    (HB0018)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB1040
    (HB1367)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot PointSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 27, 2018 12:58 P.M.