Literacy

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0493
    (SB0638)
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading InstructionDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0910
    (SB0548)
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and InterventionsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Third Reading Passed (136-0)Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1311Education - Individual Reading Improvement Plans - RequirementsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1415 / CH0361
    (SB1092)
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1525
    (SB0727)
State Personnel – Employee Mentoring LeaveDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1657Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Maryland Reading Standards Matrix - EstablishedDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0485Education - Maryland Early Literacy Initiative Program - EstablishedSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0548
    (HB0910)
Education – Students With Reading Difficulties – Screenings and InterventionsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0638
    (HB0493)
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading InstructionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0727
    (HB1525)
State Personnel - Employee Mentoring LeaveSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB1092
    (HB1415 / CH0361)
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 3:28 P.M.