Lobbying

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0367Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessDelegate ReznikIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0438
    (SB0253)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0976
    (SB0550)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Ethics (G2)
SB0253
    (HB0438)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0550
    (HB0976)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.