Local Government Mandates

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0040St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate MorganIn the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0046 / CH0248Animal Control Units - Impounded Animals - IdentificationDelegate ChangApproved by the Governor - Chapter 248Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0057 / CH0083Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of ModificationsDelegate CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 83Environment and Transportation
1/26/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0083Elections - Early Voting Centers - Sunday VotingDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0086 / CH0205
    (SB0421 / CH0204)
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native LanguageDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0291Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Small BusinessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0309
    (SB0324 / CH0013)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Delegate BuschIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledAppropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0434Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0494 / CH0267Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016)Delegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0561Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2016Delegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0566
    (SB0142)
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale AdvertisingDelegate SophocleusIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0572Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0640
    (SB0003)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - AttorneysDelegate SophocleusIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0796
    (SB0801)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1141Prince George's County - County Employees - Taxation and Retirement PG 437-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1153Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1199Prince George's County - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Unit PG 312-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1330Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational FacilitiesDelegate OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1397
    (SB0821 / CH0233)
Participating Governmental Units - Amortization ScheduleDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0003
    (HB0640)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - AttorneysSenator AstleIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0104 / CH0018Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - FinancingChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0142
    (HB0566)
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale AdvertisingAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0238Public Safety - Law Enforcement Dogs - Protective EquipmentSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0268Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentitySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0324 / CH0013
    (HB0309)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Senator MillerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0406Public Safety - Maryland Freestate ChalleNGe Academy - FundingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0421 / CH0204
    (HB0086 / CH0205)
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native LanguageSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0472
    (HB0580)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0738Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0801
    (HB0796)
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0821 / CH0233
    (HB1397)
Participating Governmental Units - Amortization ScheduleSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.