Local Government Mandates

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0009
    (SB0112)
Baltimore City - Police Districts - RedistrictingDelegate McCrayIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0203
    (SB0852)
Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - ApplicabilityDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0268Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - ExemptionDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0468Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Application to Leased PropertiesDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0573
    (SB0456 / CH0437)
Carroll County - State's Attorney - SalaryCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0751Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit SupplementDelegate LongIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0815 / CH0272
    (SB0401 / CH0271)
State Retirement and Pension System - Membership ElectionsDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0871
    (SB0652)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0938
    (SB0132)
Property Tax - Exemption for Disabled Veterans - Percentage of DisabilityDelegate RoseIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1064
    (SB0478)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1138
    (SB1152)
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Distribution and Recreational FacilitiesDelegate AliIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1141
    (SB1094)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1218Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial ConditionsDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1238Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal PropertyDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1286Harford County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations in Municipal CorporationsDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1300 / CH0419Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider DisplacementCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB1391
    (SB0801)
Baltimore County - Class 5 BreweryDelegate BrooksIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1426Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1635Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Community PolicingDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0112
    (HB0009)
Baltimore City - Police Districts - RedistrictingSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0132
    (HB0938)
Property Tax - Exemption for Disabled Veterans - Percentage of DisabilitySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0172
    (HB0152 / CH0023)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0214Local Government - Public Nuisances - Restriction on Local "Padlock" LawsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB0239Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Property Owned by New or Relocated BusinessSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0401 / CH0271
    (HB0815 / CH0272)
State Retirement and Pension System - Membership ElectionsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 271Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0456 / CH0437
    (HB0573)
Carroll County - State's Attorney - SalaryCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0457 / CH0436
    (HB0574)
Carroll County - Sheriff's SalaryCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 436Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0478
    (HB1064)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0652
    (HB0871)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0801
    (HB1391)
Baltimore County - Class 5 BrewerySenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0830Correctional Facilities - Individual Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security NotificationSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0852
    (HB0203)
Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - ApplicabilitySenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1094
    (HB1141)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1152
    (HB1138)
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational FacilitiesSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.