Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten ProgramsDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0317
    (SB0260)
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)Delegate ClarkIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0389Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal OrganizationsDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1014Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports WageringDelegate TurnerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1025
    (SB0932)
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to CheatingDelegate SanchezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB1171 / CH0299Gaming - State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Regulation of Reconciliation of ProceedsDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1346Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Authorization and ImplementationDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1369
    (SB0867)
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries - Limits on Production and On-Premises SalesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0260
    (HB0317)
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0383 / CH0336
    (HB1622 / CH0335)
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset ExtensionSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0415Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Workgroup to Study Data Collection to Assist Small BusinessesSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0836Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports WageringSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0900 / CH0853
    (HB1378)
Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Regulation and Prohibition on Operation of Electronic DeviceSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 853Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0932
    (HB1025)
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to CheatingSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationGaming (C7)
SB1015Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Operators and Video Lottery FacilitiesSenator MillerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationGaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.