Lottery

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0138Video Lottery Proceeds - Education Trust Fund - Security and Mental Health Services at Public SchoolsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0487Crimes - Gaming and Lottery Devices and Slot Machines - PenaltiesDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0507Baltimore County Public Schools - Enrollment and Transfer - Parental DecisionDelegate WeirIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0538Video Lottery Facility - Credit Extensions to Patrons - LimitationDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0567Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed EstablishmentsDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB0579Veterans' Organizations - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Use of ProceedsDelegate ElliottIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0646 / CH0629
    (SB0918)
Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations MC 5-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0662Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on PayoutsDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB0673Prince George's County - Video Lottery Operation License - Awarded to Highest BidderDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0752 / CH0137Video Lottery Gaming - Term of LicenseChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0816 / CH0070
    (SB0629 / CH0069)
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and ConsumptionAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0840Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight - MembershipDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1020 / CH0143Baltimore City - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact GrantsDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1053 / CH0041
    (SB0282 / CH0040)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1059 / CH0662Baltimore City - Video Lottery Operation Licensee - Employee Data CollectionDelegate HaynesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 662Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1155 / CH0578Video Lottery Facilities - Table Game ProceedsDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 578Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0272State Lottery Agency - Tickets - Electronic Devices Connected to the InternetSenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0282 / CH0040
    (HB1053 / CH0041)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0629 / CH0069
    (HB0816 / CH0070)
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and ConsumptionSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0743
    (HB0860 / CH0647)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Senator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and TaxationRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0905 / CH0577Video Lottery Facilities - Table Game ProceedsSenator DeGrangeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 577Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0917 / CH0580Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 580Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0918
    (HB0646 / CH0629)
Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' OrganizationsSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesGaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.