Lottery

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0427Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - EstablishmentDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0428Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - EstablishmentDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0906Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and ProcessesDelegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1112State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Hearing CommitteeChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1113 / CH0299Video Lottery Facilities - Operation and Employee Licenses - Crimes or Acts of Moral Turpitude or GamblingChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1114 / CH0118State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - AuthorizedChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1115 / CH0119Gaming - Video Lottery Employee - Temporary LicenseChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1193
    (SB0228)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0228
    (HB1193)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0595 / CH0311
    (HB0486)
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0683State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - EstablishedSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0764Video Lottery Terminals - Changes Affecting Proceeds - Legislative ApprovalSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationGaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.