Lottery

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten ProgramsDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0035Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grant DistributionDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0130
    (SB0032)
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race CourseDelegate BeidleIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0181Prince George's County - Video Lottery Facility - Local Development Council Membership PG 403-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0317
    (SB0260)
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act)Delegate ClarkIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0611
    (SB0454)
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal OrganizationsDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1025
    (SB0932)
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to CheatingDelegate SanchezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB1721
    (SB1158)
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - ModificationsDelegate WalkerIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceHorse Racing (C6)
HB1806
    (SB1254)
Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - PenaltiesDelegate SanchezIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Gaming (C7)
SB0032
    (HB0130)
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race CourseSenator DeGrangeIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0260
    (HB0317)
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0454
    (HB0611)
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal OrganizationsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0932
    (HB1025)
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to CheatingSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationGaming (C7)
SB1158
    (HB1721)
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - ModificationsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
SB1254
    (HB1806)
Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - PenaltiesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)

April 9, 2018 3:26 P.M.