Managed Care Organizations

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB1290 / CH0309Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Pharmacy Networks - PlanDelegate AdamsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 309Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
Public Health (J1)
HB1291Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Enrollees Access to Pharmacy Services (Any Willing Pharmacy)Delegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.