Manslaughter

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0477Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before JudgmentDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0478
    (SB0861)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0909 / CH0650
    (SB0872)
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and ManslaughterDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 650Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1184
    (SB0847)
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0847
    (HB1184)
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0861
    (HB0478)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0872
    (HB0909 / CH0650)
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and ManslaughterSenator JacobsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.