Maps and Charts

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0071Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic AreaDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0233Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0236Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of MapDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0407
    (SB0325)
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control StandardsFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersEnvironment (M3)
HB0832
    (SB0361)
Congressional Districting ProcessDelegate NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0953
    (SB0907)
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1085
    (SB0641)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1199Citizens' Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1385Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Deadline ExtensionDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB0325
    (HB0407)
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control StandardsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0361
    (HB0832)
Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0391
    (HB0106)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0641
    (HB1085)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0671 / CH0520Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0907
    (HB0953)
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection ActSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.