Maps and Charts

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0157State Highways - Electronic Map of Public Trash ReceptaclesDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0243 / CH0177
    (SB0968 / CH0178)
Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and ExtensionDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 177Economic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0356
    (SB0307)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0961 / CH0176Rural Broadband Communication ServicesDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1350 / CH0628
    (SB1006 / CH0629)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0307
    (HB0356)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0968 / CH0178
    (HB0243 / CH0177)
Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and ExtensionSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1006 / CH0629
    (HB1350 / CH0628)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:04 P.M.