Marriage

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0047Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married CouplesDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0056 / CH0348State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Criminal History Records ChecksDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0060Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate SmigielIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0361 / CH0368Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0380 / CH0617Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married CouplesDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 617Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1031 / CH0518
    (SB0658 / CH0517)
Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health InsuranceDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0198 / CH0204Estates and Trusts - Family AllowanceSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0658 / CH0517
    (HB1031 / CH0518)
Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health InsuranceSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.