Marriage

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0033Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate SmigielIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2014 - 3:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0236
    (SB0208)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0448
    (SB0769)
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage PenaltyDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0542
    (SB0017)
Family Law - Performance of Marriage CeremoniesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary Family Law (D4)
HB0548
    (SB0672)
Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married CouplesDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0570
    (SB0621)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented EstateDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1042
    (SB0648 / CH0322)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of DeathDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1444
    (SB1037)
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery OrganizationAllegany County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Family Law (D4)
SB0017
    (HB0542)
Family Law - Performance of Marriage CeremoniesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0208
    (HB0236)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Family Law (D4)
SB0621
    (HB0570)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented EstateSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0648 / CH0322
    (HB1042)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of DeathSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0672
    (HB0548)
Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married CouplesSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0769
    (HB0448)
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage PenaltySenator GettyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1037
    (HB1444)
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery OrganizationSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.