Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0987Vehicle Laws - Security Lapses - Notice to Maryland Automobile Insurance FundDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1045
    (SB0743 / CH0852)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Peer–to–Peer Car SharingDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1161 / CH0195
    (SB0856 / CH0196)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsDelegate BrooksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1514Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Low-Cost Automobile Insurance ProgramDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0743 / CH0852
    (HB1045)
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing ProgramsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0856 / CH0196
    (HB1161 / CH0195)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1265 / CH0030Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:04 P.M.