Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0602
    (SB0598)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - West Fairland Local Park RenovationsDelegate ZuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0635Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Restrictions on Commissioners from Montgomery County MC/PG 102-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0637 / CH0626Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 626Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0639 / CH0627Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0873Workers' Compensation - Public Safety EmployeesDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1447
    (SB1020)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Glassmanor Recreational Center RenovationsDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1455 / CH0687Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0549Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Multiuse FieldsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0598
    (HB0602)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - West Fairland Local Park RenovationsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1020
    (HB1447)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Glassmanor Recreational Center RenovationsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1050Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Aviation MuseumSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.