Mass Transit

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0084
    (SB0116 / CH0049)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0183Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0334Criminal Law - Marijuana Consumption in Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0423
    (SB0304)
Maryland Commission on Health in All PoliciesDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0450
    (SB0386)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0777Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0891
    (SB1035)
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - RepealDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1010Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning BoardDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1011Department of Transportation - Modal Administrations - AppointmentsDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1023
    (SB0966)
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From Shady Grove to the City of FrederickDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1026Maryland Transit Administration - Fares - Calculation and Public CommentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1134Equality in Education Act PG 434-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1304
    (SB1036)
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - PenaltyDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1338Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 CorridorDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1382Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1402 / CH0032
    (SB1125)
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement ActDelegate McIntoshEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1439Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1486Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 440-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1607
    (SB1052 / CH0025)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
HB1640
    (SB1167)
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims ActCarroll County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0116 / CH0049
    (HB0084)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0199Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0304
    (HB0423)
Maryland Commission on Health in All PoliciesSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0318Department of Transportation - Heads of Modal Administrations - Senate ConfirmationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0386
    (HB0450)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0779Land Use - Proposed Development Project - Transit and Traffic Adequacy StudiesSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0966
    (HB1023)
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From the City of Gaithersburg to the City of FrederickSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1035
    (HB0891)
Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery RateSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1036
    (HB1304)
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - PenaltySenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1052 / CH0025
    (HB1607)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Senator FergusonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25Budget and Taxation
3/1/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1125
    (HB1402 / CH0032)
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement ActSenator FergusonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1167
    (HB1640)
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims ActSenator ReadyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.