Mass Transit

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0028Criminal Law - Assault - Public Transportation Operator and PenaltiesDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0209Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Municipal Agreements PG 401-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0312 / CH0619Criminal Law – School Bus Driver and Public Transportation Worker – Obstructing, Hindering, or Interfering WithDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0370 / CH0353
    (SB0279 / CH0354)
Metro Board Member ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0533 / CH0355
    (SB0494 / CH0356)
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact – Department of Planning – Name CorrectionDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 355Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0548
    (SB1073)
Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - RequirementsDelegate HealeyVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0683Criminal Law - Assault of Public Transportation Operator - PenaltiesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0703Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0744 / CH0717
    (SB0850 / CH0718)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 717Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0816 / CH0830Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - AlterationsDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0939Regional Carbon Cost Collection InitiativeDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0961 / CH0176Rural Broadband Communication ServicesDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0978
    (SB0624)
State Income and Property Tax Credits - Purple Line Construction ZoneDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1076Maryland Transit Administration - Station Safety Pilot ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1089
    (SB0894)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActDelegate BarronIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1380State Highway Administration - Access to State Highways - Consideration of Pedestrian, Bicycle, and Public Transportation ActivityDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1390Land Use - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Enhanced Public BenefitsDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1433Prince George’s County – Artwork at Purple Line Transit Stations – Local Approval PG 431–18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1436Maryland Transit Administration - Purple Line Transit Stations - NamingPrince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1468 / CH0793Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) ProgramDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 793Environment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1818
    (SB1249)
Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 434-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0088Prince George's County - Land Use - Magnetic Levitation Transportation SystemSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0279 / CH0354
    (HB0370 / CH0353)
Metro Board Member ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 354Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0494 / CH0356
    (HB0533 / CH0355)
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name CorrectionSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0624
    (HB0978)
State Income and Property Tax Credits – Purple Line Construction ZoneSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0804Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0834Transportation - Transit Service - State GrantsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0850 / CH0718
    (HB0744 / CH0717)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 718Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0894
    (HB1089)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1073
    (HB0548)
Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - ApplicationSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1149Appropriations and Public–Private Partnerships – Transit Lines – Three–Station RequirementSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1249
    (HB1818)
Prince George's County - Reduction in and Exemptions From the School Facilities Surcharge - Sunset ExtensionSenator RosapepeIn the House - Second Reading PassedBudget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/9/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 5, 2018 3:35 P.M.