Meat, Poultry, Seafood

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0120 / CH0101Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product MarketingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0602
    (SB0422)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Delegate RobinsonIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0768
    (SB0917 / CH0353)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0422
    (HB0602)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0917 / CH0353
    (HB0768)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 2:00 P.M.