Mediation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0296
    (SB0305 / CH0224)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0697 / CH0634
    (SB0409)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - ApplicabilityDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 634Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0895 / CH0648Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 648Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0932 / CH0566
    (SB0832 / CH0565)
Child Care - Dispute ResolutionDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1147Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures - Required Documents - Request for Waiver of Mediation Filing FeeDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0167Residential Condominiums - Governing Documents - Claims ProvisionsSenator KelleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0305 / CH0224
    (HB0296)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0409
    (HB0697 / CH0634)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - ApplicabilitySenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0832 / CH0565
    (HB0932 / CH0566)
Child Care - Dispute ResolutionSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.