Mediation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0257
    (SB0293 / CH0288)
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0490
    (SB0749)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0968
    (SB0753)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1181 / CH0370
    (SB1066 / CH0369)
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting RequirementsDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0293 / CH0288
    (HB0257)
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0749
    (HB0490)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0753
    (HB0968)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1066 / CH0369
    (HB1181 / CH0370)
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting RequirementsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.