Mediation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0505 / CH0670
    (SB0390 / CH0669)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0778Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program ProcessDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1016 / CH0519Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1170
    (SB0250)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1496Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1632Baltimore City School Police Officers - Guidelines and Training - Discipline and Public SafetyDelegate Washington, M.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0250
    (HB1170)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0363Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0390 / CH0669
    (HB0505 / CH0670)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0446Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0472
    (HB0580)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0761Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0950Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program ProcessSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (45-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1026Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsPresidentIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.