Medical Assistance

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0016
    (SB0261)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0116 / CH0039
    (SB0267 / CH0038)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0373
    (SB0151 / CH0193)
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate RegulationDelegate Haddaway-RiccioVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0600
    (SB0502)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and FinanceHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB0931
    (SB0496 / CH0280)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - TelemedicineDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1137
    (SB0898)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1242Correctional Services - Inmate Health Care Services - BillingDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1245
    (SB0822)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1267Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1328
    (SB0332 / CH0455)
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State AgenciesDelegate SmigielVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1329Medical Assistance Programs - Fraud and Abuse PreventionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0151 / CH0193
    (HB0373)
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate RegulationSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Finance
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0195 / CH0202
    (HB1062 / CH0203)
Hospitals - Notice to Patients - Outpatient Status and Billing ImplicationsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 202Finance
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0261
    (HB0016)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0267 / CH0038
    (HB0116 / CH0039)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0332 / CH0455
    (HB1328)
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State AgenciesSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0496 / CH0280
    (HB0931)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - TelemedicineSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0502
    (HB0600)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0678Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0822
    (HB1245)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0898
    (HB1137)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1074Task Force to Evaluate the Impact of Maryland's Proposal to Maintain the Medicare WaiverSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB1075State Medicare Waivers - Applications, Reapplications, Modifications, or Amendments - Legislative Approval RequiredSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.