Medical Assistance

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0106 / CH0084Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset ExtensionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0119
    (SB0134 / CH0001)
Maryland Health Insurance Plan - Access for Bridge Eligible IndividualsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 1/14 at 12:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
1/14/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0166
    (SB0449)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0273
    (SB0262)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0399 / CH0398Public Health - Medical Records Charges - Medicaid EnrolleesDelegate MurphyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Health and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0452
    (SB0562)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0590 / CH0413Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and RepealChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0637
    (SB0537)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Rare and Expensive Case Management Program - Waiver AmendmentDelegate HubbardIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0792
    (SB0695)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - CoverageDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0802 / CH0426
    (SB0198 / CH0141)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - TelemedicineDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0846Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care ServicesDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0871Health - Compensation for Mental Health Services Providers - WorkgroupDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0954Medicaid Streamlined Eligibility Act of 2014Delegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1072Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1235 / CH0449Community Integrated Medical Home ProgramDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1257
    (SB0592 / CH0181)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Community Health Workers - Certification and ReimbursementDelegate TarrantIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1267 / CH0353
    (SB0882 / CH0352)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder WorkgroupDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Health and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1336Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Enrollment of Individuals - InformationDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1434Community Services - Provider ReimbursementDelegate HammenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1497Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi SyndromeDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0098 / CH0025Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing RulesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 25Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0134 / CH0001
    (HB0119)
Maryland Health Insurance Plan - Access for Bridge Eligible IndividualsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 1Finance
1/14/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0172 / CH0464
    (HB0162)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations Operating Budget (B1)
SB0198 / CH0141
    (HB0802 / CH0426)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - TelemedicineSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0257 / CH0150Task Force to Study Access to Pharmacy Services in MarylandSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 150Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0262
    (HB0273)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0279Correctional Services - Inmate Health Care Services - BillingSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance Public Safety (E4)
SB0449
    (HB0166)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0537
    (HB0637)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Rare and Expensive Case Management Program - Waiver AmendmentSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0562
    (HB0452)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0592 / CH0181
    (HB1257)
Workgroup on Workforce Development for Community Health WorkersSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 181Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0667Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Universal Health Care Program - Plan for EstablishmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0695
    (HB0792)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - CoverageSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0721Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Down Syndrome (Micah's Law)Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0882 / CH0352
    (HB1267 / CH0353)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder WorkgroupSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.