Medical Malpractice

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1029
    (SB0783)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1114
    (SB0836)
Health Care Malpractice - Awards and Judgments - Periodic PaymentsDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1265
    (SB0835)
Patient Safety Early Intervention ProgramsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Health (J1)
HB1296 / CH0597
    (SB0981 / CH0596)
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 597Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1310
    (SB0834)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1313 / CH0583State Board of Physicians - Consultation, Qualification for Licensure, License Renewal, and Representation to the PublicDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 583Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1316
    (SB0771)
Postjudgment Interest - Medical InjuryDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0771
    (HB1316)
Postjudgment Interest - Medical InjurySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0783
    (HB1029)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0834
    (HB1310)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0835
    (HB1265)
Patient Safety Early Intervention ProgramsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)
SB0836
    (HB1114)
Health Care Malpractice - Awards and Judgments - Periodic PaymentsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0981 / CH0596
    (HB1296 / CH0597)
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - RevisionsSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.