Medical Malpractice

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0091Health Occupations - Sexual Orientation Change Efforts - ProhibitedDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations Health Occupations (J2)
HB0283
    (SB0034)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0395
    (SB0702)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0402 / CH0399
    (SB0314 / CH0153)
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Health and Government Operations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0635Health Care Malpractice - Expression of Regret or Apology - InadmissibilityDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0930Health Care Malpractice - Limitation on Noneconomic DamagesDelegate ElliottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0996Admissibility of Writings or Records of Health Care ProvidersDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1009
    (SB0789)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjuryDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1337
    (SB0798)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1363
    (SB0832)
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of CoverageDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0034
    (HB0283)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0314 / CH0153
    (HB0402 / CH0399)
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0702
    (HB0395)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Senator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0789
    (HB1009)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0798
    (HB1337)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0832
    (HB1363)
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of CoverageSenator KelleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.