Medical Research

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0267
    (SB0109 / CH0442)
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Research - Synthetic CannabinoidsDelegate SophocleusIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0399
    (SB0287)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Institutes for Behavior ResourcesDelegate TarrantIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0726
    (SB0384)
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research ProgramDelegate Turner, V.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0779
    (SB0368)
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency RequirementsDelegate TarrantIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0851
    (SB0651)
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - PenaltiesDelegate ClagettIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0948
    (SB0708)
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1100Maryland Compassionate Care ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1101 / CH0403Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana CommissionDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Health and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB1343 / CH0249
    (SB0380 / CH0248)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup on Cancer Clusters and Environmental Causes of CancerDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 249Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0109 / CH0442
    (HB0267)
Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - ProhibitionSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 442Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0287
    (HB0399)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Institutes for Behavior ResourcesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0368
    (HB0779)
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency RequirementsSenator PetersIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0380 / CH0248
    (HB1343 / CH0249)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup on Cancer Clusters and Environmental Causes of CancerSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 248Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0384
    (HB0726)
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research ProgramSenator PughIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0651
    (HB0851)
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - PenaltiesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0708
    (HB0948)
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government OperationsFinance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.