Medical Research

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0431 / CH0419Health - Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and PenaltiesDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0443Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Use of Dogs and Cats in Research Facilities - PenaltiesDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0490 / CH0251Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous RevisionsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0567Crimes Relating to Animals - Failure to Offer Dogs and Cats Used in Research Facilities for Adoption - PenaltiesDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1057Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - ProhibitionDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.