Medical Research

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0115
    (SB0013)
Maryland Health Care Commission - Electronic Prescription Records System - Assessment and ReportDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0655
    (SB0392)
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0681Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0732
    (SB0675)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0839Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANSDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1207Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Study ProgramDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1598Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display RequirementsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Passed EnrolledHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1804Health – Medical Research FundingDelegate BuschIn the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0392
    (HB0655)
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0675
    (HB0732)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Senator HoughIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB1151Income Tax - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit - AlterationSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

April 10, 2018 3:37 P.M.