Medical Schools

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0373
    (SB0151 / CH0193)
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate RegulationDelegate Haddaway-RiccioVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0893
    (SB0759)
State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1100Maryland Compassionate Care ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1101 / CH0403Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana CommissionDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Health and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB1313 / CH0583State Board of Physicians - Consultation, Qualification for Licensure, License Renewal, and Representation to the PublicDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 583Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0151 / CH0193
    (HB0373)
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate RegulationSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Finance
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0759
    (HB0893)
State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.