Medical Schools

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0490 / CH0251Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous RevisionsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0602
    (SB0320 / CH0024)
University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine FibroidsDelegate GlennVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0961
    (SB0511)
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1248Medical Schools - Use of Animals in Medical Training - ProhibitedDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0320 / CH0024
    (HB0602)
University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine FibroidsSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 24Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0511
    (HB0961)
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health ActSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.