Mentors

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0163 / CH0164
    (SB0129 / CH0163)
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Submission of a Comprehensive Master Plan - Repeal of Duplicative RequirementDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0509Green Career Gender Empowerment and Training Pilot ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1139 / CH0300Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and SupportDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1403 / CH0033
    (SB1170)
Next Generation Scholars of MarylandDelegate McIntoshEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1410
    (SB0493 / CH0740)
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016Delegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0129 / CH0163
    (HB0163 / CH0164)
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Submission of a Comprehensive Master Plan - Repeal of Duplicative RequirementSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0493 / CH0740
    (HB1410)
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016Senator PinskyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1170
    (HB1403 / CH0033)
Next Generation Scholars of MarylandSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.