Midwives

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0569Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician AssistantDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0909
    (SB0862)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1437 / CH0528
    (SB1114 / CH0529)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0862
    (HB0909)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1114 / CH0529
    (HB1437 / CH0528)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.