Minorities

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0086
    (SB0148)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Boyds Negro SchoolDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0092
    (SB0498 / CH0453)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0319 / CH0562Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of Supplier Diversity and Inclusion and Minority Business Enterprise Program MC/PG 106-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0433
    (SB0309 / CH0438)
State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business ParticipationSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0708 / CH0551State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit OrganizationsDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0993
    (SB0462)
Commission to Study the Disproportionate Justice Impact on MinoritiesDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1138
    (SB1152)
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Distribution and Recreational FacilitiesDelegate AliIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1196Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted AreasDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB1443
    (SB0999)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActDelegate GlennIn the House - House Concur - Senate AmendmentsHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1465Baltimore City - Police Community Policing Steering CommitteeDelegate HayesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1506 / CH0633
    (SB0700 / CH0634)
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - RenamingDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 633Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1517
    (SB0465 / CH0629)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansDelegate GlennVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1519
    (SB0471)
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquityDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1634Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Public School System - ReportsDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0004 / CH0340Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and ReauthorizationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0148
    (HB0086)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Boyds Negro SchoolSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0228 / CH0452Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0309 / CH0438
    (HB0433)
State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business ParticipationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0462
    (HB0993)
Commission to Study the Disproportionate Justice Impact on MinoritiesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0471
    (HB1519)
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquitySenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0498 / CH0453
    (HB0092)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0508Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business InternationallySenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0700 / CH0634
    (HB1506 / CH0633)
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - RenamingSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 634Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0712Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability ProgramSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1197Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and StudiesSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:34 A.M.