Mopeds

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0003Motor Vehicles - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Valid Drivers' Licenses or PermitsDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0430 / CH0371Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor VehiclesChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0789
    (SB0715 / CH0309)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013Delegate IveyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0911Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Issuance, Renewal, and ExpirationDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1179
    (SB0472)
Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer DecalsDelegate ConwayIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0472
    (HB1179)
Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer DecalsSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0715 / CH0309
    (HB0789)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013Senator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 309Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.