Mortgages

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0088
    (SB0199 / CH0205)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0291 / CH0465
    (SB0383 / CH0464)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0522
    (SB0465)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0621 / CH0625
    (SB0627)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0794 / CH0640
    (SB0696)
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - LiensDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 640Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1008Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013Delegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1195Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on RentalsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB1209 / CH0268
    (SB0436 / CH0267)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1368Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0060 / CH0011Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans - Financial Assistance for Families of Limited IncomeChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0199 / CH0205
    (HB0088)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0383 / CH0464
    (HB0291 / CH0465)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
SB0436 / CH0267
    (HB1209 / CH0268)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0465
    (HB0522)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
Finance
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0487
    (HB0603)
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0627
    (HB0621 / CH0625)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramSenator RamirezIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0696
    (HB0794 / CH0640)
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - LiensSenator StoneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0743
    (HB0860 / CH0647)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Senator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and TaxationRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0994Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.